EP4290837 - HINGE STRUCTURE, AND FOLDABLE ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.11.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANG, Jaeho Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jungjin Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2023/50] | Application number, filing date | 23707845.6 | 07.03.2023 | [2023/50] | WO2023KR95009 | Priority number, date | KR20220053645 | 29.04.2022 Original published format: KR 20220053645 | KR20220066247 | 30.05.2022 Original published format: KR 20220066247 | [2023/50] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023211261 | Date: | 02.11.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4290837 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.11.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/02, G06F1/16 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
G06F1/1681 (EP);
G06F1/1652 (EP);
H04M1/022 (EP);
H04M1/0268 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/50] | H04M1/02, F16C11/04, G06F1/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHARNIERSTRUKTUR UND KLAPPBARE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2023/50] | English: | HINGE STRUCTURE, AND FOLDABLE ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING SAME | [2023/50] | French: | STRUCTURE DE CHARNIÈRE, ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE PLIABLE LA COMPRENANT | [2023/50] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2023 | Translation filed | 09.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2020383215 (KIM JONGYOON [KR], et al); | [XAI]WO2022019621 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) | International search | [A]CN208565248U (JARLLYTEC CO LTD) [A] 1-15* See claim 1 and figures 1-8. *; | [A]KR20190108600 (MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC [US]) [A] 1-15 * See claim 1 and figures 4a-8c. *; | [A]CN213711587U (JARLLYTEC CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0030]-[0033] and figure 3. *; | [A]KR20220039675 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0021]-[0065] and figures 1a-4. *; | [A]KR20220050462 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See claim 1 and figures 3-6. * |