EP4361950 - BATTERY CELL DEFECT DETECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2024 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology (Hong Kong) Limited Level 19, China Building 29 Queen's Road Central Central, Central And Western District / HK | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/18] | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited No. 2 Xingang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Zhiyu Ningde Fujian 352100 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Xi Ningde Fujian 352100 / CN | 03 /
JIANG, Guannan Ningde Fujian 352100 / CN | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Gong, Jinping CocreateIP Neumarkterstr. 21 81673 München / DE | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 23740926.3 | 30.03.2023 | [2024/18] | WO2023CN85201 | Priority number, date | CN202211132007 | 16.09.2022 Original published format: CN202211132007 | [2024/18] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2024055569 | Date: | 21.03.2024 | Language: | ZH | [2024/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4361950 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.03.2024 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G06T7/11, G06T7/136, G01N21/88 | [2024/34] | CPC: |
G06T7/0004 (EP);
G01N21/8851 (US);
G01N2021/8887 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30164 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2024/18] | G06T7/00, G06T7/11, G06T7/136 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG VON BATTERIEZELLENDEFEKTEN UND COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2024/18] | English: | BATTERY CELL DEFECT DETECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2024/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉTECTION DE DÉFAUT D'ÉLÉMENT DE BATTERIE, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2024/18] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2023 | Translation filed | 24.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2023 | Examination requested [2024/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]CN113409296 (GUANGDONG LYRIC ROBOT INTELLIGENT AUTOMATION CO LTD); | [YA]CN114627092 (GUANGDONG LIYUAN HUNGRY INTELLIGENT EQUIPMENT CO LTD) | International search | [Y]CN110824371 (GUANGDONG LYRIC ROBOT INTELLIGENT AUTOMATION CO LTD); | [A]CN112557390 (HUIZHOU XUXIN INTELLIGENT TECH CO LTD); | [A]US2021209739 (WEN YAWEI [CN], et al); | [Y]CN113409296 (GUANGDONG LYRIC ROBOT INTELLIGENT AUTOMATION CO LTD); | [Y]CN114627092 (GUANGDONG LIYUAN HUNGRY INTELLIGENT EQUIPMENT CO LTD); | [PX]CN115829921 (NINGDE CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECH CO LTD) |