EP4297176 - HIGHLY HEAT RESISTANT BATTERY PACK CONNECTOR FOR PREVENTING THERMAL RUNAWAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | 24.11.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Chang Hun Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 23767156.5 | 08.03.2023 | [2023/52] | WO2023KR03150 | Priority number, date | KR20220030698 | 11.03.2022 Original published format: KR 20220030698 | [2023/52] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023172055 | Date: | 14.09.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4297176 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/572, H01M50/502, H01M50/521, H01M50/581 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
H01M50/296 (EP);
H01M50/572 (KR);
H01R13/405 (US);
H01M50/204 (EP);
H01M50/502 (KR);
H01M50/521 (KR);
H01M50/581 (KR);
B29C45/14 (US);
B29L2031/36 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHHITZEBESTÄNDIGER BATTERIEPACKVERBINDER ZUR VERHINDERUNG VON THERMISCHEM DURCHGEHEN | [2023/52] | English: | HIGHLY HEAT RESISTANT BATTERY PACK CONNECTOR FOR PREVENTING THERMAL RUNAWAY | [2023/52] | French: | CONNECTEUR DE BLOC-BATTERIE HAUTEMENT RÉSISTANT À LA CHALEUR POUR EMPÊCHER UN EMBALLEMENT THERMIQUE | [2023/52] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2023 | Translation filed | 21.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]KR20000077059 ; | [A]JP2009230895 (J S T MFG CO LTD); | [YDAD]KR20170059669 (DSC CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20170073468 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20190009976 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | KR101136682B | KR101668787B | KR20170059669 | KR20220030698 |