EP4332159 - POLYLACTIDE RESIN COMPOSITION HAVING EXCELLENT CRYSTALLIZATION HALF-TIME, AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Jeong Hun Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Jeongkyu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
AN, Yujin Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
CHOE, Yeonji Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
OH, Sung Joon Daejeon 34122 / KR | 06 /
OH, Wan Kyu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 23775185.4 | 27.02.2023 | [2024/10] | WO2023KR02704 | Priority number, date | KR20220035553 | 22.03.2022 Original published format: KR 20220035553 | [2024/10] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023182687 | Date: | 28.09.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4332159 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.09.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/00, C08K5/3432, C08K5/11, C08L67/04, C08G63/664, C08K5/3462 | [2024/42] | CPC: |
C08L67/04 (EP,KR);
C08K5/0083 (EP,KR);
C08K5/3462 (EP,US);
C08G63/664 (EP);
C08K5/11 (KR,US);
C08K5/3432 (KR);
C08K2201/018 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/04, C08L67/04, C08K5/3462 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2024/10] | C08K5/00, C08K5/3432, C08K5/11, C08L67/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYLACTIDHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT HERVORRAGENDER KRISTALLISATIONSHALBZEIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2024/10] | English: | POLYLACTIDE RESIN COMPOSITION HAVING EXCELLENT CRYSTALLIZATION HALF-TIME, AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME | [2024/10] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE DE POLYLACTIDE AYANT UN EXCELLENT DEMI-TEMPS DE CRISTALLISATION, ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2024/10] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2023 | Translation filed | 28.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003038405 (BOPP RICHARD C [US], et al); | [Y]JP2008115372 (KAO CORP); | [Y]JP2011080048 (NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SCIEN, et al); | [Y]JP2016011388 (RICOH CO LTD); |