EP4339244 - THERMOPLASTIC RESIN COMPOSITION, METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME, AND MOLDED PRODUCT MANUFACTURED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.12.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | 16.02.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEON, Jiyoon Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
AHN, Bong Keun Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Min Jung Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Jangwon Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Eunji Daejeon 34122 / KR | 06 /
KIM, Seyong Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2024/12] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 23818215.8 | 31.05.2023 | [2024/12] | WO2023KR07428 | Priority number, date | KR20220072524 | 15.06.2022 Original published format: KR 20220072524 | [2024/12] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023243908 | Date: | 21.12.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4339244 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C08L51/04, C08L25/12, C08F285/00, C08F265/06, C08F212/12 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
C08L33/12 (EP);
C08L51/04 (KR);
C08F212/12 (KR);
C08F265/04 (EP);
C08F265/06 (KR);
C08F285/00 (EP,KR);
C08L25/12 (KR);
C08L2205/025 (EP);
C08L2205/03 (EP);
C08L2207/53 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F265/04, C08F212/08, C08F220/44, C08F220/1804 (EP);
C08F285/00, C08F212/08, C08F220/44, C08F220/1804 (EP);
C08L33/12, C08L51/04, C08L51/04 (EP);
C08L51/04, C08L33/12 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMOPLASTISCHE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTES FORMPRODUKT | [2024/12] | English: | THERMOPLASTIC RESIN COMPOSITION, METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME, AND MOLDED PRODUCT MANUFACTURED THEREFROM | [2024/12] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE THERMOPLASTIQUE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET PRODUIT MOULÉ FABRIQUÉ À PARTIR DE CELLE-CI | [2024/12] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2023 | Translation filed | 15.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3944631 (YU ARTHUR J, et al); | [Y]KR100201985B (BASF AG [DE]); | [A]KR20130075793 (CHEIL IND INC [KR]); | [Y]KR101333578B ; | [Y]KR20220020200 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) | by applicant | KR20220072524 |