EP4379016 - WATER REPELLENT OIL REPELLENT AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.04.2024 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.02.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | 03.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Osaka Umeda Twin Towers South 1-13-1, Umeda, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUDA, Michio Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | 02 /
SAKASHITA, Hirotoshi Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | 03 /
SHIBATA, Shun Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | 04 /
UEHARA, Tetsuya Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/23] | Application number, filing date | 23848771.4 | 11.10.2023 | [2024/23] | WO2023JP36899 | Priority number, date | JP20220164285 | 12.10.2022 Original published format: JP 2022164285 | [2024/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2024080310 | Date: | 18.04.2024 | Language: | JA | [2024/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4379016 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/18, D21H19/10, D21H21/14 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
C09K3/18 (EP);
D21H17/16 (EP);
D21H17/17 (EP);
D21H17/28 (EP);
D21H19/10 (EP);
D21H19/54 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERABWEISENDES ÖLABWEISENDES MITTEL | [2024/23] | English: | WATER REPELLENT OIL REPELLENT AGENT | [2024/23] | French: | AGENT HYDROFUGE ET OLÉOFUGE | [2024/23] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2024 | Translation filed | 19.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2005029940 (NIPPON KOONSUTAAC KK); | [A]CN105421144 (GUANGZHOU ZHIZAO BIOLOGICAL SCIENCE & TECH CO LTD); | [Y]WO2020054856 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]); | [Y]WO2021229451 (SWM LUXEMBOURG SARL [LU]); | [Y]WO2022080464 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) | by applicant | WO2022080464 |