EP4403805 - VALVE DEVICE AND NEGATIVE-PRESSURE HANDLING DEVICE WITH VALVE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 02.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | 02.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J. Schmalz GmbH Johannes-Schmalz-Straße 1 72293 Glatten / DE | [2024/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gauß, Jan 72250 Freudenstadt / DE | [2024/30] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2024/30] | Application number, filing date | 24150381.2 | 04.01.2024 | [2024/30] | Priority number, date | DE202310101130 | 18.01.2023 Original published format: DE102023101130 | [2024/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4403805 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F16K11/044, F16K15/18, F16K31/00, F16K31/06, F16K31/08, F16K37/00, F16K51/02, B25J15/06 | [2024/30] | CPC: |
F16K31/003 (EP);
B25B11/005 (US);
B25J15/0625 (EP);
F16K15/184 (US);
F16K15/1845 (EP);
F16K31/0627 (EP);
F16K31/082 (EP);
F16K37/005 (EP);
F16K37/0091 (US);
F16K51/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/36] |
Former [2024/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VENTILVORRICHTUNG UND UNTERDRUCKHANDHABUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT VENTILVORRICHTUNG | [2024/30] | English: | VALVE DEVICE AND NEGATIVE-PRESSURE HANDLING DEVICE WITH VALVE DEVICE | [2024/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SOUPAPE ET DISPOSITIF DE MANIPULATION PAR DÉPRESSION AVEC DISPOSITIF DE SOUPAPE | [2024/30] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/36] | 31.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3508151 (MAN TECHNOLOGIE GMBH [DE]); | [Y]US2010163766 (ALVAREZ RAPHAEL [CH], et al); | [A]US8678776 (MEDOW RALF [DE], et al); | [Y]CN208221717U (COBURG TECH JIANGSU CO LTD); | [Y]DE102018217103 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]US2021371214 (BUFFAT EMMANUEL [FR], et al); | [A]US11549502 (VAN DER MERWE DIRK A [US], et al) |