EP4345159 - METHODS FOR TRAPPING AND BARCODING DISCRETE BIOLOGICAL UNITS IN HYDROGEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scipio Bioscience 17 rue de la Vanne 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2024/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDELSTEIN, Stuart J. 75002 Paris / FR | [2024/14] | Representative(s) | Icosa 83 avenue Denfert-Rochereau 75014 Paris / FR | [2024/14] | Application number, filing date | 24150478.6 | 04.05.2018 | [2024/14] | Priority number, date | US201762502180P | 05.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762502180 P | [2024/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4345159 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4345159 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6806, C12Q1/6874, C12N5/00 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
C12N15/1096 (EP,GB,KR,US);
C12Q1/6874 (GB,KR);
A61K47/06 (US);
A61K47/6903 (US);
B01D61/00 (EP);
C12Q1/6806 (GB,KR);
C12Q1/682 (US);
C12Q1/6823 (US);
C12Q1/6869 (US);
C12Q1/6876 (US);
C12Q1/6809 (US);
C12Q2527/125 (GB,KR);
C12Q2535/122 (GB,KR);
C12Q2547/107 (GB,KR);
C12Q2563/149 (GB,KR);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6806, C12Q2527/125, C12Q2535/122, C12Q2547/107, C12Q2563/149, C12Q2563/159, C12Q2563/179 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6874, C12Q2535/122, C12Q2547/107, C12Q2563/149, C12Q2563/159 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2024/14] | C12N5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM EINFANGEN UND BARCODIEREN EINZELNER BIOLOGISCHER EINHEITEN IN HYDROGEL | [2024/14] | English: | METHODS FOR TRAPPING AND BARCODING DISCRETE BIOLOGICAL UNITS IN HYDROGEL | [2024/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE PIÉGEAGE ET DE CODAGE À CODE-BARRES D'UNITÉS BIOLOGIQUES DISCRÈTES DANS UN HYDROGEL | [2024/14] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18733327.3 / EP3619325 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015200541 (BIO RAD LABORATORIES [US]); | [X]WO2016118915 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US], et al); | [AD]WO2016130704 (ILLUMINA INC [US]); | [A]WO2017075265 (BROAD INST INC [US], et al); | by applicant | WO2005003304 | WO2014093676 | WO2014124338 | WO2014189957 | US2015066385 | WO2015095226 | WO2015126766 | WO2015200869 | US2015376609 | WO2016003814 | US2016060621 | WO2016061517 | WO2016130704 | US2016265069 | US2016289669 |