EP4345863 - BACTERIOSTATIC METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ushio Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 1-6-5, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8150 / JP | [2024/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAITO, Keisuke Tokyo, 100-8150 / JP | [2024/14] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [2024/14] | Application number, filing date | 24151462.9 | 15.02.2021 | [2024/14] | Priority number, date | JP20200025620 | 18.02.2020 Original published format: JP 2020025620 | JP20200096731 | 03.06.2020 Original published format: JP 2020096731 | [2024/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4345863 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4345863 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01J65/00, A61L2/10, H01J61/16 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
A61L2/10 (EP,KR,US);
H01J61/16 (KR,US);
H01J65/00 (KR);
A61L2202/11 (EP);
A61L2202/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61L2202/25 (EP);
H01J65/046 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/14] | H01J61/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/14] | Title | German: | BAKTERIOSTATISCHES VERFAHREN | [2024/14] | English: | BACTERIOSTATIC METHOD | [2024/14] | French: | PROCEDE BACTERIOSTATIQUE | [2024/14] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP21757272.6 / EP4109493 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2018023935 (RITSUMEIKAN) | by applicant | JP2014136113 | JP2018517488 | JP6607623B |