EP4331383 - SOLID PASTE COMPOSITION FOR COOKING AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | 05.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | 05.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mizkan Holdings Co., Ltd. 6 Nakamura-cho 2-chome Handa-shi, Aichi 475-8585 / JP | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Makoto Aichi, 475-8585 / JP | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Hasegawa, Kan Patentanwaltskanzlei Hasegawa Untere Hauptstraße 56 85354 Freising / DE | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 24151995.8 | 14.02.2020 | [2024/10] | Priority number, date | JP20190025874 | 15.02.2019 Original published format: JP 2019025874 | WO2019JP35164 | 06.09.2019 Original published format: PCT/JP2019/035164 | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4331383 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4331383 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A23L7/109, A23L11/00 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
A23L11/05 (EP);
A23L7/109 (EP,KR);
A23L11/07 (KR,US);
A23L19/01 (EP,KR);
A23L19/09 (EP,KR);
A23L29/06 (KR);
A23L29/212 (EP,KR);
A23L29/281 (KR);
A23L33/115 (KR,US);
A23L33/17 (KR,US);
A23L33/21 (EP,KR,US);
A23P10/22 (KR,US);
A23P30/20 (KR,US);
A23P30/00 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP,KR);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/124, A23V2300/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2024/10] | A23L11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Title | German: | FESTE PASTENZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUM KOCHEN UND VERFHAREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2024/10] | English: | SOLID PASTE COMPOSITION FOR COOKING AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2024/10] | French: | COMPOSITION DE PATE SOLIDE POUR CUISSON ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2024/10] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/10] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20755938.6 / EP3821719 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]CN108244501 (LIU JIMING); | [XA]WO2018166876 (BARILLA FLLI G & R [IT]); | [XA]US2018360079 (AL-KATIB MURAD [CA], et al); | by applicant | JPH06253759 | JP2013247953 | JP2014221024 |