EP4375493 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A NONWOVEN FABRIC USED AS AN ENGINE HOOD INSULATOR MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hassan Tekstil Sanayi Ve Ticaret A.S. Akcaburgaz Mah. Hadimkoy Yolu No:88 34522 Esenyurt/Istanbul / TR | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SISMAN, Ahmet 34522 Akcaburgaz Mah. Hadimkoy Yolu No:88 Esenyurt/ Istanbul / TR | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Demirkiran, Hasan Kordinat Inovasyon ve Fikri Mülkiyet Yonetimi Ltd. Sti. Nispetiye Mah. Nispetiye Cad. Levent Is Merkezi No:6 K2 34340 Etiler Besiktas Istanbul / TR | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 24152746.4 | 22.10.2019 | [2024/22] | Priority number, date | TR20180021007 | 28.12.2018 Original published format: TR 201821007 | TR20190013785 | 11.09.2019 Original published format: TR 201913785 | [2024/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4375493 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F02B77/11, D04H1/587, D04H1/66, D04H1/68 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
D04H1/68 (EP,US);
D04H1/48 (US);
D04H1/488 (US);
D04H1/587 (EP);
D04H1/66 (EP,US);
D04H18/02 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ALS MOTORHAUBENISOLATIONSMATERIAL VERWENDETEN VLIESES | [2024/22] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A NONWOVEN FABRIC USED AS AN ENGINE HOOD INSULATOR MATERIAL | [2024/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN TISSU NON TISSÉ UTILISÉ COMME MATÉRIAU ISOLANT DE CAPOT DE MOTEUR | [2024/22] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19853293.9 / EP3902989 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03021096 (HP CHEM PELZER RES & DEV LTD [IE], et al); | [AD]US6749929 (ENKLER MICHAEL FRED [DE], et al); | [A]US2007260014 (SIMON ULRICH [DE], et al) | by applicant | US6749929 | WO2004080710 | EP2628837 |