EP4387387 - METHOD, APPARATUS, AND SYSTEM FOR SENDING SIDELINK CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION REPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | 02.08.2024 | Change - classification | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | 02.08.2024 | Change - classification | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Haibo Guangdong, 518129 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Jun Guangdong, 518129 / CN | 03 /
WEI, Dongdong Guangdong, 518129 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Jian Guangdong, 518129 / CN | [2024/25] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [2024/25] | Application number, filing date | 24154367.7 | 06.11.2020 | [2024/25] | Priority number, date | CN20191190524 | 08.11.2019 Original published format: CN201911090524 | [2024/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4387387 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4387387 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/10, H04W72/23, // H04W76/14, H04W92/18 | [2024/36] | CPC: |
H04W72/23 (EP);
H04B7/0626 (EP,CN,KR);
H04W24/10 (EP,CN);
H04W72/20 (US);
H04L1/1858 (KR);
H04W4/40 (EP,KR);
H04W72/25 (KR);
H04W72/543 (US);
H04W92/18 (EP,KR,US);
H04W76/14 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/25] | H04W92/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUM SENDEN VON SIDELINK-KANALSTATUSINFORMATIONSBERICHTEN | [2024/25] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS, AND SYSTEM FOR SENDING SIDELINK CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION REPORT | [2024/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET SYSTÈME D'ENVOI DE RAPPORT D'INFORMATIONS D'ÉTAT DE CANAL DE LIAISON LATÉRALE | [2024/25] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20883867.2 / EP4057681 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2021091302 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | by applicant | CN20191190524 |