EP4342356 - DISHWASHER COMPRISING A LOW PROFILE RACK AND WASH ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | 12.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Whirlpool Corporation 2000 North M-63 MD 3601 Benton Harbor, MI 49022 / US | [2024/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Balinski, Steven B. Benton Harbor, MI 49022 / US | 02 /
Brightbill, David Jason Benton Harbor, MI 49022 / US | 03 /
Roderick, Frederick Thomas Benton Harbor, MI 49022 / US | 04 /
Ferencevich, Joseph T. Benton Harbor, MI 49022 / US | 05 /
Roth, Ryan Kevin Benton Harbor, MI 49022 / US | 06 /
Snell, William J. Benton Harbor, MI 49022 / US | 07 /
Naik, Sujit S. Benton Harbor, MI 49022 / US | 08 /
Feddema, Mark S. Benton Harbor, MI 49022 / US | [2024/13] | Representative(s) | PGA S.p.A., Milano, Succursale di Lugano Via Castagnola, 21c 6900 Lugano / CH | [2024/13] | Application number, filing date | 24156625.6 | 13.03.2019 | [2024/13] | Priority number, date | US201815927377 | 21.03.2018 Original published format: US201815927377 | [2024/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4342356 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4342356 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/22, // A47L15/50, A47L15/00 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
A47L15/22 (EP,CN,US);
A47L15/0065 (EP,US);
A47L15/4214 (US);
A47L15/4219 (CN);
A47L15/4246 (US);
A47L15/428 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2024/13] | A47L15/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] | Title | German: | GESCHIRRSPÜLMASCHINE MIT EINEM SPRÜHROHR MIT NICHTKREISFÖRMIGEM QUERSCHNITT | [2024/13] | English: | DISHWASHER COMPRISING A LOW PROFILE RACK AND WASH ASSEMBLY | [2024/13] | French: | LAVE-VAISSELLE COMPRENANT UN TUBE DE PULVÉRISATION AYANT UNE FORME DE SECTION TRANSVERSALE NON CIRCULAIRE | [2024/13] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19162568.0 / EP3545811 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3361361 (SCHUTTE MARLIN D); | [A]DE1628479 (BORGHI GIOVANNI); | [I]WO2009041899 (ASKO CYLINDA AB [SE], et al); | [XA]DE102009033895 (WHIRLPOOL CORP DELAWARE CORP [US]); | [I]EP2912983 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) | by applicant | US2003226580 | WO2009041899 | US2009159103 | US7594513 | DE102009033895 | US2012138106 | EP2912983 | WO2016206712 | US20100959673 |