EP4358433 - MONITORING APPARATUS AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imprenditore Pty Limited 215 Mann Street Armidale, NSW 2350 / AU | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICE, Patrick Armidale, NSW, 2350 / AU | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Chaillot 16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 24157033.2 | 12.07.2007 | [2024/17] | Priority number, date | AU20060903740 | 12.07.2006 Original published format: AU 2006903740 | AU20070902358 | 04.05.2007 Original published format: AU 2007902358 | [2024/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4358433 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4358433 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04L67/12, H04L67/02, H04B17/00, H04L67/025, H04B7/185 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
H04B7/1851 (EP,BR,CN,US);
H04B10/07 (KR);
H04L67/025 (EP,BR,CN,US);
G05B15/02 (BR,US);
G06F11/3089 (BR,US);
G06F21/6218 (BR,US);
|
Former IPC [2024/17] | H04B7/185 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2024/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM | [2024/17] | English: | MONITORING APPARATUS AND SYSTEM | [2024/17] | French: | APPAREIL ET SYSTÈME DE CONTRÔLE | [2024/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07719182.3 / EP2047617 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6553336 (JOHNSON ROBERT N [US], et al); | [XA]US2003076369 (RESNER BENJAMIN I [US], et al) |