EP4417081 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MULTI-LAYERED ELEMENT PROVIDED WITH A REINFORCEMENT FOR A SHOE UPPER, MULTI-LAYERED ELEMENT PRODUCED BY SUCH A METHOD, AND SHOE UPPER PROVIDED WITH SUCH A REINFORCEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALC Tecnologie Adesive S.r.l. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [2024/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VICENTINI, Luca 10123 Torino / IT | [2024/34] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2024/34] | Application number, filing date | 24157656.0 | 14.02.2024 | [2024/34] | Priority number, date | IT20230002748 | 17.02.2023 Original published format: IT202300002748 | [2024/34] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4417081 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A43D8/34, A43B23/02, B32B5/02 | [2024/34] | CPC: |
A43D8/34 (EP);
A43B23/0235 (EP);
A43B23/0255 (EP);
A43B23/026 (EP);
A43B23/028 (EP);
B32B5/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | GE | Not yet paid | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MEHRSCHICHTIGEN ELEMENTS MIT VERSTÄRKUNG FÜR EIN SCHUHOBERTEIL, MIT DIESEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTES MEHRSCHICHTIGES ELEMENT UND SCHUHSCHAFT MIT EINER SOLCHEN VERSTÄRKUNG | [2024/34] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MULTI-LAYERED ELEMENT PROVIDED WITH A REINFORCEMENT FOR A SHOE UPPER, MULTI-LAYERED ELEMENT PRODUCED BY SUCH A METHOD, AND SHOE UPPER PROVIDED WITH SUCH A REINFORCEMENT | [2024/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT MULTICOUCHE AVEC RENFORT POUR TIGE DE CHAUSSURE, ÉLÉMENT MULTICOUCHE OBTENU PAR UN TEL PROCÉDÉ ET TIGE DE CHAUSSURE AVEC TEL RENFORT | [2024/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1936919 (JOHN SMITH); | [Y]US2017151 (GEORGE HAZELTON, et al); | [Y]US2041701 (ROSKE MILTON H); | [YA]US2018192740 (HSIAO CHUNG-HU [TW], et al) | by applicant | EP2043474 |