EP4365896 - DETERMINATION OF SPATIAL AUDIO PARAMETER ENCODING AND ASSOCIATED DECODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VASILACHE, Adriana Tampere / FI | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 24157987.9 | 09.09.2020 | [2024/19] | Priority number, date | GB20190013274 | 13.09.2019 Original published format: GB 201913274 | [2024/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4365896 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4365896 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/008, G10L19/24, G10L19/002, G10L19/22, // G10L19/02 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
G10L19/008 (EP,GB,KR,US);
G10L19/032 (GB,KR,US);
G10L19/0017 (EP,KR,US);
G10L19/0204 (EP,KR);
G10L19/22 (EP);
G10L19/24 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [2024/19] | G10L19/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG DER CODIERUNG RÄUMLICHER AUDIOPARAMETER UND ZUGEHÖRIGE DECODIERUNG | [2024/19] | English: | DETERMINATION OF SPATIAL AUDIO PARAMETER ENCODING AND ASSOCIATED DECODING | [2024/19] | French: | DÉTERMINATION DE CODAGE DE PARAMÈTRE AUDIO SPATIAL ET DÉCODAGE ASSOCIÉ | [2024/19] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20863003.8 / EP4029015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5978762 (SMYTH STEPHEN MALCOLM [US], et al); | [A]US2009030678 (KOVESI BALAZS [FR], et al); | [A]US7668715 (CHAUGULE RAVINDRA RAMKRISHNA [IN], et al); | [A]WO2018142017 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]) |