EP4353078 - HELMINTHORIUM TURCICUM-RESISTANT PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KWS SAAT SE & Co. KGaA Grimsehlstraße 31 37574 Einbeck / DE | For all designated states Universität Zürich Rämistrasse 71 8006 Zürich / CH | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ouzunova, Milena 37075 Göttingen / DE | 02 /
Scheuermann, Daniela 37574 Einbeck / DE | 03 /
Keller, Beat 8006 Zürich / CH | 04 /
Krattinger, Simon 8906 Bonstetten / CH | 05 /
Wicker, Thomas 8536 Hüttwilen / CH | 06 /
Herren, Gerhard 8625 Gossau / CH | 07 /
Bender, Severine 35075 Gladenbach / DE | 08 /
Kessel, Bettina 37574 Einbeck / DE | 09 /
Presterl, Thomas 37574 Einbeck / DE | 10 /
Knaak, Carsten 37079 Göttingen / DE | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Gollierstraße 4 80339 München / DE | [2024/16] | Application number, filing date | 24159022.3 | 03.09.2014 | [2024/16] | Priority number, date | DE20131014637 | 04.09.2013 Original published format: DE102013014637 | DE20141005823 | 24.04.2014 Original published format: DE102014005823 | [2024/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4353078 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/16] | Classification | IPC: | A01H1/04, C12Q1/68, C12N15/82, A01H5/00 | [2024/30] | CPC: |
C12N15/8282 (EP,US);
C07K14/415 (US);
C12Q1/6895 (US);
C12Q2600/13 (US);
C12Q2600/156 (US);
C12Q2600/158 (US)
|
Former IPC [2024/16] | A01H5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Title | German: | HELMINTHOSPORIUM TURCICUM-RESISTENTE PFLANZE | [2024/16] | English: | HELMINTHORIUM TURCICUM-RESISTANT PLANT | [2024/16] | French: | PLANTE RÉSISTANTE AU HELMINTHOSPORIUM TURCICUM | [2024/16] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14761579.3 / EP3041345 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | WO0029592 | WO2007147395 | WO2010079430 | WO2011072246 | WO2011163590 |