EP4350130 - INTEGRATED ENGINE BRAKE CONFIGURATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Intelligent Power Limited 30 Pembroke Road Dublin 4 / IE | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANWINGERDEN, Mark Battle Creek, 49015 / US | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstraße 22 80796 München / DE | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 24159404.3 | 09.08.2018 | [2024/15] | Priority number, date | US201762545184P | 14.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762545184 P | US201762550950P | 28.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762550950 P | US201762575598P | 23.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762575598 P | [2024/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4350130 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4350130 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F02D13/04, F01L1/18, F02D13/02, F01L13/00, F01L1/20 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
F02D13/04 (EP);
F01L13/06 (EP,US);
F01L1/047 (US);
F01L1/18 (US);
F01L1/181 (EP);
F01L1/20 (EP);
F01L1/26 (EP);
F01L1/462 (US);
F01L2001/467 (US);
F01L2013/101 (EP);
F01L2013/103 (EP);
F01L2013/105 (EP);
F01L2800/06 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/15] | F01L1/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTE MOTORBREMSENKONFIGURATION | [2024/15] | English: | INTEGRATED ENGINE BRAKE CONFIGURATION | [2024/15] | French: | CONFIGURATION DE FREIN MOTEUR INTÉGRÉ | [2024/15] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18845817.8 / EP3669058 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2011015603 (EATON SRL [IT], et al); | [XYI]WO2014001560 (EATON SRL [IT]); | [XAY]WO2016207348 (EATON SRL [IT]) |