EP4349440 - CORRELATIVE EFFECT AUGMENTED REALITY SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universal City Studios LLC 100 Universal City Plaza Universal City, CA 91608 / US | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAUTHAMER, Akiva Meir Orlando, 32819 / US | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Keltie LLP No. 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 24160106.1 | 21.01.2021 | [2024/15] | Priority number, date | US202016779148 | 31.01.2020 Original published format: US202016779148 | [2024/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4349440 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4349440 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A63J5/02 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
A63J5/021 (EP,KR);
G06T19/006 (KR,US);
A63G31/16 (KR);
A63J21/00 (KR,US);
A63J5/02 (US);
G02B27/0101 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR ERWEITERTE REALITÄT MIT KORRELATIVER WIRKUNG | [2024/15] | English: | CORRELATIVE EFFECT AUGMENTED REALITY SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2024/15] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉALITÉ AUGMENTÉE À EFFET CORRÉLATIF | [2024/15] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP21705781.9 / EP4096801 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010253700 (BERGERON PHILIPPE [US]); | [A]US2012313839 (SMITHWICK QUINN [US], et al); | [A]US2016097971 (HORIKOSHI RYOKO [JP], et al); | [A]US2019294031 (LEY STEPHEN [GB], et al) |