EP4374891 - PRESSURIZED GAS POWERED LIQUID TRANSFER DEVICE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enable Injections, Inc. 2863 E. Sharon Road Cincinnati, OH 45241 / US | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEIGER, Daniel Newport, KY 41071 / US | 02 /
LOWE, James Milford, OH 45150 / US | 03 /
STEFANCHIK, David Morrow, OH 45152 / US | 04 /
BOURELLE, Dylan L. San Francisco, CA 94109 / US | 05 /
HUDDLESTON, Matthew J. Loveland, OH 45140 / US | 06 /
PALMER, Joetta, Renee Mason, OH 45040 / US | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Geary, Stephen Bawden & Associates Rothamsted Enterprises Russell Building West Common Harpenden, Hertfordshire AL5 2JQ / GB | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 24160931.2 | 16.10.2018 | [2024/22] | Priority number, date | US201762572911P | 16.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762572911 P | [2024/22] | Previously filed application, date | WO2018US56130 | 16.10.2018 | [2024/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4374891 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4374891 | Date: | 28.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/20, A61M5/178 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
A61J1/2096 (EP,US);
A61J1/201 (EP,US);
A61J1/2072 (EP,US);
A61M5/1782 (EP);
A61J1/2013 (EP);
A61J1/2065 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2024/22] | A61M5/178 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Title | German: | DRUCKGASBETRIEBENE FLÜSSIGKEITSÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM | [2024/22] | English: | PRESSURIZED GAS POWERED LIQUID TRANSFER DEVICE AND SYSTEM | [2024/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE TRANSFERT DE LIQUIDE ALIMENTÉ PAR GAZ SOUS PRESSION | [2024/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18867945.0 / EP3697367 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011220116 (LOWENSTEIN STEPHEN JAY [US], et al); | [A]US2012123382 (KUBO TOMOHIKO [JP]); | [YA]WO2014204894 (ENABLE INJECTIONS LLC [US]); | [YA]WO2016154413 (ENABLE INJECTIONS INC [US]) | by applicant | WO2014204894 | WO2016154413 |