EP4389379 - STRONG AND TOUGH STRUCTURAL WOOD MATERIALS, AND METHODS FOR FABRICATING AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Maryland, College Park UM Ventures 0134 Lee Building 7809 Regents Drive College Park, MD 20742 / US | [2024/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Liangbing Potomac, MD, 20854 / US | 02 /
ZHU, Mingwei Gulou District, Nanjing, 210093 / CN | 03 /
SONG, Jianwei College Park, MD, 20740 / US | [2024/26] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2024/26] | Application number, filing date | 24161497.3 | 09.04.2018 | [2024/26] | Priority number, date | US201762483828P | 10.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762483828 P | US201862627600P | 07.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862627600 P | [2024/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4389379 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Classification | IPC: | B27K5/00, B27K1/00, B27K5/06, D21C3/00, D21C3/02, B27K5/04 | [2024/35] | CPC: |
B27K5/065 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B27K3/32 (CN,KR);
B27K3/0278 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01D11/0288 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01D11/0492 (EP,CN,KR);
B27K3/153 (EP,CN,KR);
B27K3/16 (EP,CN,US);
B27K3/20 (CN,KR,US);
B27K3/34 (EP,CN,KR);
B27K3/36 (CN,US);
B27K3/38 (CN,US);
B27K3/48 (CN,US);
B27K5/007 (EP,CN,KR);
B27K5/02 (CN,KR);
B27K5/04 (EP,CN);
B32B21/13 (CN,US);
B32B7/12 (US);
D21C3/00 (EP,CN,KR);
D21C3/022 (CN,US);
D21C3/12 (CN,US);
D21C9/005 (CN,US);
D21C9/007 (CN,US);
B27K2240/10 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B27K2240/30 (CN,US);
B27K2240/70 (CN,KR,US);
B32B2307/558 (CN);
B32B2419/00 (CN,US);
B32B2439/00 (CN);
B32B2479/00 (CN,US);
B32B2571/00 (CN,US);
B32B2605/08 (CN);
B32B2605/10 (CN);
B32B2605/12 (CN);
B32B2605/18 (CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/26] | B27K5/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] | Title | German: | FESTE UND ZÄHE STRUKTURHOLZMATERIALIEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2024/26] | English: | STRONG AND TOUGH STRUCTURAL WOOD MATERIALS, AND METHODS FOR FABRICATING AND USE THEREOF | [2024/26] | French: | MATÉRIAUX EN BOIS STRUCTURAUX RÉSISTANTS ET RÉSISTANTS, ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2024/26] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18783970.9 / EP3609661 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |