EP4356949 - BENDABLE TUBE WITH IMPROVED ELASTIC HINGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fortimedix Assets II B.V. Urmonderbaan 22, Gebouw 250 6167 RD Geleen / NL | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thissen, Mattheus Hendrik Louis 6071 NC Swalmen / NL | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 24162817.1 | 26.09.2017 | [2024/17] | Priority number, date | NL20162017570 | 03.10.2016 Original published format: NL 2017570 | NL20172019173 | 04.07.2017 Original published format: NL 2019173 | [2024/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4356949 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/01 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
A61B1/00073 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B1/0055 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B1/0058 (CN,US);
A61B17/00234 (CN);
A61M25/0013 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61M25/0054 (EP,CN,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] | Title | German: | BIEGBARES ROHR MIT VERBESSERTEM ELASTISCHEM SCHARNIER | [2024/17] | English: | BENDABLE TUBE WITH IMPROVED ELASTIC HINGE | [2024/17] | French: | TUBE PLIABLE À CHARNIÈRE ÉLASTIQUE AMÉLIORÉE | [2024/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17787048.2 / EP3518729 | EP20163687.5 / EP3733045 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US2007049800 | WO2015084157 | WO2015084174 | EP2273911 | WO2016089202 | WO2017082720 | NL2016900B | WO2015NL50798 | WO2016NL50471 | WO2016NL50522 |