EP4411568 - TRANSFER OF BREATHING ASSISTANCE APPARATUS DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place 2013 Auckland / NZ | [2024/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASSE, Benjamin Wilson 2013 East Tamaki / NZ | 02 /
READ, Matthew Joel 2013 East Tamaki / NZ | [2024/32] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2024/32] | Application number, filing date | 24164898.9 | 21.11.2013 | [2024/32] | Priority number, date | US201261729744P | 26.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261729744 P | [2024/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4411568 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4411568 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/00, G06F16/955, G16H10/60, G16H40/20, G16H40/63 | [2024/34] | CPC: |
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
G06F16/9554 (EP,US);
G16H10/60 (EP,US);
G16H40/20 (EP,US);
H04L41/0293 (US);
H04L67/12 (US);
F04C2270/041 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/32] | G06F16/955 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/32] | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNG VON BEATMUNGSVORRICHTUNGSDATEN | [2024/32] | English: | TRANSFER OF BREATHING ASSISTANCE APPARATUS DATA | [2024/32] | French: | TRANSFERT DES DONNÉES D'UN APPAREIL D'ASSISTANCE RESPIRATOIRE | [2024/32] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13856546.0 / EP2923283 | EP20156130.5 / EP3699783 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6666377 (HARRIS SCOTT C [US]); | [I]US2007213938 (KAI AKINORI [JP]); | [A]WO2012028999 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [A]US2012291783 (PEIRIS MALIK TIVANKA RAJIV [NZ], et al) |