EP4372453 - LENS DRIVING DEVICE, AND CAMERA MODULE AND OPTICAL DEVICE COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 10.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG INNOTEK CO., LTD. 30, Magokjungang 10-ro Gangseo-gu Seoul 07796 / KR | [2024/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Sung Guk Seoul 07796 / KR | 02 /
SON, Byung Wook Seoul 07796 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Seong Min Seoul 07796 / KR | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | M. Zardi & Co S.A. Via G. B. Pioda, 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [2024/21] | Application number, filing date | 24167218.7 | 29.06.2018 | [2024/21] | Priority number, date | KR20170083121 | 30.06.2017 Original published format: KR 20170083121 | KR20170159338 | 27.11.2017 Original published format: KR 20170159338 | [2024/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4372453 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4372453 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G03B5/02, G03B17/02, G02B27/64, G03B17/12, G02B7/02 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
G03B5/02 (EP,CN,US);
H04M1/0264 (CN);
G02B27/64 (US);
G02B27/646 (EP,CN);
G02B7/08 (EP);
G02B7/09 (CN,US);
G03B13/36 (CN);
G03B17/02 (CN);
G03B17/12 (CN,US);
G03B3/10 (EP);
G03B30/00 (EP,CN);
H02K41/0356 (EP);
H04N23/51 (EP);
H04N23/55 (EP,CN);
G02B7/023 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2024/21] | G02B27/64 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] | Title | German: | LINSENANSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND KAMERAMODUL SOWIE OPTISCHE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2024/21] | English: | LENS DRIVING DEVICE, AND CAMERA MODULE AND OPTICAL DEVICE COMPRISING SAME | [2024/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAÎNEMENT DE LENTILLE, ET MODULE DE CAMÉRA ET DISPOSITIF OPTIQUE LE COMPRENANT | [2024/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18825086.4 / EP3647865 | EP22205004.9 / EP4160306 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2024 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   10.09.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016178925 (PARK SANG OK [KR], et al); | [A]US2016209621 (PARK SANG OK [KR], et al) |