EP4372901 - BATTERY MODULE, POWER BATTERY PACK AND VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BYD Company Limited No. 3009, BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | [2024/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HE, Kefeng Shenzhen, 518118 / CN | 02 /
JIANG, Wenfeng Shenzhen, 518118 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Xinyue Shenzhen, 518118 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Hui Shenzhen, 518118 / CN | 05 /
ZHU, Yan Shenzhen, 518118 / CN | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | Dehns Germany Partnerschaft mbB Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/21] | DehnsGermany Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 24167376.3 | 25.06.2019 | [2024/21] | Priority number, date | CN201920942577U | 21.06.2019 Original published format: CN 201920942577 U | [2024/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4372901 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4372901 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/211, H01M50/547, H01M50/548, H01M50/55, H01M10/04, H01M10/052, H01M10/0585, H01M10/42, H01M50/249, H01M50/471, H01M50/51, H01M50/533, H01M50/593 | [2024/34] | CPC: |
H01M10/4235 (EP);
H01M50/51 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/474 (US);
H01M10/04 (KR);
H01M10/0413 (EP);
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M10/0585 (EP,US);
H01M10/653 (KR,US);
H01M50/211 (EP,KR);
H01M50/24 (KR,US);
H01M50/249 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/471 (EP);
H01M50/477 (US);
H01M50/533 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/547 (EP,US);
H01M50/548 (EP);
H01M50/55 (EP);
H01M50/593 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2024/21] | H01M50/593 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] | Title | German: | BATTERIEMODUL, BATTERIEPACK UND FAHRZEUG | [2024/21] | English: | BATTERY MODULE, POWER BATTERY PACK AND VEHICLE | [2024/21] | French: | MODULE DE BATTERIE, BLOC-BATTERIE D'ALIMENTATION ET VÉHICULE | [2024/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19934188.4 / EP3958346 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2004071173 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]CN201766132U (BEIJING GLOBE SUPER POWER NEW ENERGY TECHNOLOGY DEV CORP, et al); | [A]US2016226053 (WU YANG [US], et al); | [Y]US2017092986 (OGAWA HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]EP3379600 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [Y]CN208272041U (JIANGSU TAFEL NEW ENERGY TECH CO LTD, et al) |