EP4375631 - HYDROGEN SULFIDE IMAGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | 27.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | 27.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rebellion Photonics, Inc. 2327 Commerce Street, Suite 200 Houston, TX 77002 / US | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KESTER, Robert Timothy Houston, 77002 / US | 02 /
HAGEN, Nathan Adrian Houston, 77002 / US | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 24167503.2 | 26.05.2016 | [2024/22] | Priority number, date | US201562168620P | 29.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562168620 P | [2024/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4375631 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4375631 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/02, G01J3/28, G01J3/32, G02B13/14, G01J3/42, G01J5/0808, G01J5/08, G01N33/00, G01J3/12, G01N21/3504, H04N5/33, H04N17/00, G01J5/0806, G01J5/53, G01J3/36, // G01J5/00, G01J5/60 | [2024/31] | CPC: |
G01N33/0044 (EP,US);
G01J3/0208 (EP,US);
G01J3/021 (EP,US);
G01J3/0286 (EP,US);
G01J3/2803 (EP,US);
G01J3/2823 (EP,US);
G01J3/32 (EP,US);
G01J3/36 (EP,US);
G01J3/42 (EP,US);
G01J5/0014 (EP,US);
G01J5/0806 (EP,US);
G01J5/0808 (EP,US);
G01J5/0896 (EP,US);
G01J5/53 (EP,US);
G01J5/602 (EP,US);
G01N21/3504 (EP,US);
H04N17/002 (EP,US);
H04N23/20 (EP);
H04N5/33 (US);
G01J2003/1247 (EP,US);
G01J2003/2826 (EP,US);
G01J2003/2869 (EP,US);
G01J2005/0077 (EP,US);
G01J2005/604 (EP,US);
G01N2021/3531 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/22] | G01J5/53 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Title | German: | WASSERSTOFFSULFID-ABBILDUNGSSYSTEM | [2024/22] | English: | HYDROGEN SULFIDE IMAGING SYSTEM | [2024/22] | French: | SYSTÈME D'IMAGERIE À SULFURE D'HYDROGÈNE | [2024/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16804077.2 / EP3304014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US8653461 (BENSON ROBERT G [US], et al); | [Y]US8686364 (LITTLE III JOSEPH PAUL [US], et al); | [IY]US2015069239 (KESTER ROBERT T [US], et al); | by applicant | US2015316473 | US2016097713 |