EP4376481 - DATA TRANSMISSION METHODS, TERMINAL DEVICE AND NETWORK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHI, Cong Dongguan, Guangdong, 523860 / CN | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 24170205.9 | 16.01.2019 | [2024/22] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4376481 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4376481 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/12 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
H04W40/22 (EP,CN);
H04W28/12 (EP,CN);
H04L5/0044 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG UND NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG | [2024/22] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION METHODS, TERMINAL DEVICE AND NETWORK DEVICE | [2024/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES, DISPOSITIF TERMINAL ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU | [2024/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19910738.4 / EP3893547 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2018143600 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]US2018376457 (TSENG YUNG-LAN [TW], et al); |