EP0000191 - Process for inserting an insulating screen of elastic and preferably fire-resistant material between a floor and a suspended ceiling and/or a partition wall, preferably above a partition wall and a screen for carrying out the process. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 12.11.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
FR
LU
NL
SE
SPAFI - SOCIETE ANONYME DE PARTICIPATIONS FINANCIERES ET INDUSTRIELLES Les Miroirs 18, Avenue d'Alsace F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | For:DE
Grünzweig + Hartmann und Glasfaser AG Bürgermeister-Grünzweig-Strasse 1-47 D-67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/36] | For:BE
CH
FR
LU
NL
SE
SPAFI - SOCIETE ANONYME DE PARTICIPATIONS FINANCIERES ET INDUSTRIELLES Les Miroirs 18, Avenue d'Alsace F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
For:DE
Grünzweig + Hartmann und Glasfaser AG Bürgermeister-Grünzweig-Strasse 1-47 D-67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
Former [1980/22] | For:BE
CH
FR
LU
NL
SE
SAINT-GOBAIN INDUSTRIES 62, Bd Victor Hugo F-92209 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | ||
For:DE
Grünzweig + Hartmann und Glasfaser AG Bürgermeister-Grünzweig-Strasse 1-47 D-67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sommer, Rolf Mutterstadter Strasse 5 D-6701 Dannstadt / DE | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/02] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [1984/24] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1980/22] | Betzler, Eduard, Dipl.-Phys., et al Postfach 70 02 09 Plinganserstrasse 18a D-8000 München 70 / DE | Application number, filing date | 78100231.6 | 23.06.1978 | Priority number, date | DE19772729608 | 30.06.1977 Original published format: DE 2729608 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0000191 | Date: | 10.01.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0000191 | Date: | 29.10.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1978 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/16, E04G21/14, E04B1/82, E04B1/94 | [1980/22] | CPC: |
E04B2/7411 (EP);
B65D85/07 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Einsetzen einer aus elastischem vorzugsweise nicht brennbarem Dämmaterial bestehenden Abschottung zwischen Rohdecke und Unterdecke und/oder Trennwand, vorzugsweise im Bereich über einer Trennwand und Abschottung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens. | English: | Process for inserting an insulating screen of elastic and preferably fire-resistant material between a floor and a suspended ceiling and/or a partition wall, preferably above a partition wall and a screen for carrying out the process. | French: | Procédé de mise en place d'un écran et de préférence, résistant au feu entre un plancher brut et un plafond suspendu et/ou une cloison de préférence au dessus d'une cloison et écran pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé. | Examination procedure | 10.05.1979 | Examination requested | 20.08.1979 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 20.11.1979 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.04.1980 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1980 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1980 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.07.1981
30.10.1981
ADMISSIBLE Rheinhold & Mahla GmbH Gneisenaustrasse 15 D-80992 München / DE Opponent's representative Michelis, Theodor Tattenbachstrasse 9 D-80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.07.1981
30.10.1981
ADMISSIBLE Rheinhold & Mahla GmbH Gneisenaustrasse 15 D-80992 München / DE Opponent's representative Michelis, Theodor, Dipl.-Ing. Tattenbachstrasse 9 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1982/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.07.1981
30.10.1981
ADMISSIBLE Rheinhold & Mahla GmbH Gneisenaustrasse 15 D-80992 München / DE Opponent's representative Kirchner, Dietrich BAYER AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen D-5090 Leverkusen, Bayerwerk / DE | 02.11.1981 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.03.1982 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.05.1982 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 10.07.1982 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 13.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 10.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 04.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 03.09.1983 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 14.02.1984 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 06.08.1985 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1986/03] | Appeal following opposition | 09.04.1984 | Appeal received No. T0088/84 | 22.06.1984 | Statement of grounds filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1980 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.07.1980 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.06.1981 | SE | 24.06.1985 | [2015/21] |
Former [1999/52] | CH | 29.10.1980 | |
LU | 30.06.1981 | ||
SE | 24.06.1985 | ||
Former [1989/08] | CH | 29.10.1980 | |
SE | 24.06.1985 | ||
Former [1987/26] | CH | 29.10.1980 | Documents cited: | Search | US2339326 [ ] (FOURNESS CHARLES A, et al); | US3521742 [ ] (FERRELL ROBERT A); | FR2216811 [ ] (KOEPP AG [DE]) |