EP0000195 - Process for treating sludge or ashes, especially clarified sludge sewage or clarified sewage ashes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/16] | Process for treating sludge on ashes, especially clarified sludge sewage or clarified sewage ashes | ||
[1982/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saarberg-Fernwärme GmbH Sulzbachstrasse 26 D-6600 Saarbrücken / DE | For all designated states Thomasphosphatfabriken GmbH Schadowstrasse 42 D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huck, Horst, Dr.-Ing. Nelkenstrasse 5 D-6600 Saarbrücken / DE | 02 /
Munk, Harald, Dr. Dipl. Landwirt Veilchenweg 8 D-5268 Heiligenhaus-Giessenbügel / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 78100246.4 | 27.06.1978 | Priority number, date | DE19772729277 | 29.06.1977 Original published format: DE 2729277 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0000195 | Date: | 10.01.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0000195 | Date: | 21.04.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.1978 | Classification | IPC: | C05F7/00 | [1982/16] | CPC: |
C05F7/00 (EP);
Y02A40/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, FR, LU, NL | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung von Schlämmen oder Aschen, insbesondere von Klärschlamm oder Klärschlammaschen | English: | Process for treating sludge or ashes, especially clarified sludge sewage or clarified sewage ashes | [1982/16] | French: | Procédé pour le traitement des boues ou des cendres, en particulier des boues de clarification ou des cendres de boues de clarification |
Former [1982/16] | Process for treating sludge on ashes, especially clarified sludge sewage or clarified sewage ashes | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 04.07.1979 | Examination requested | 11.09.1979 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 11.03.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.03.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.06.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.09.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.06.1982 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2237127 (EBARA INFILCO [JP]); | [XP]FR2338902 (NITTETSU KAKOKI KK [JP]); | [A]FR1264788 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG); | [A]US2139419 (MORETON HENRY H); | [A]GB150375 (GEORGE YOUNG, et al); | [A]FR2260549 (SAINT GOBAIN TECHN NOUVELLES [FR]); | [A]FR2187707 (SPEICHIM [FR]); | [A]US2655883 (MARTIN WARREN S) |