EP0000510 - Polyesters containing carbonate groups [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lindner, Christian, Dr. Riehler Strasse 200 D-5000 Köln 60 / DE | 02 /
Süling, Carlhans, Dr Carl-Leverkus-Strasse 10 D-5068 Odenthal / DE | 03 /
Bartl, Herbert, Dr Eichendorffweg 10 D-5068 Odenthal / DE | 04 /
Hardt, Dietrich, Dr. Nietzschestrasse 8 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 78100380.1 | 12.07.1978 | Priority number, date | DE19772732718 | 20.07.1977 Original published format: DE 2732718 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0000510 | Date: | 07.02.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0000510 | Date: | 03.09.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1978 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/64, C08G63/66 | [1980/18] | CPC: |
C08G63/64 (EP,US);
C08G63/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | Carbonatgruppen enthaltende Polyester | English: | Polyesters containing carbonate groups | French: | Polyesters renfermant des groupes carbonates | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 12.07.1978 | Examination requested | 28.06.1979 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.1979 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1979 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.03.1980 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.1980 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.1980 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1401635 (TEIJIN LTD); | DE1964998 [ ] (BAYER AG) |