EP0001076 - Hollow building block [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/28] | Hollow building block resp. wall made from hollow building blocks | ||
[1981/28] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 04.06.1986 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firma Heinrich Oltmanns D-2905 Edewecht/Jeddeloh 1 / DE | [1980/01] |
Former [1980/01] | For all designated states no data available | ||
For all designated states (deleted) ... | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Granz, Axel, Ing.Grad. Osterkampsweg 71a D-2900 Oldenburg / DE | 02 /
Oltmanns, Heinrich D-2905 Jeddeloh I / DE | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Hauck, Hans, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing.H.Hauck, Dipl.-Phys.W.Schmitz, Dipl.-Ing.E.Graalfs, Dipl.-Ing.W.Wehnert, Dipl.-Phys.W.Carstens Dr.-Ing.W.Döring Neuer Wall 41 D-2000 Hamburg 36 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/01] | Hauck, Hans, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing.H.Hauck, Dipl.-Phys.W.Schmitz, Dipl.-Ing.E.Graalfs, Dipl.-Ing.W.Wehnert, Dipl.-Phys.W.Carstens Dr.-Ing.W.DÐring Neuer Wall 41 D-2000 Hamburg 36 / DE | ||
Former [1980/01] | Hauck, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. Mozartstrasse 23 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 78100749.7 | 25.08.1978 | Priority number, date | DE19772739409 | 01.09.1977 Original published format: DE 2739409 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0001076 | Date: | 21.03.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0001076 | Date: | 15.07.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1978 | Classification | IPC: | E04C1/40, E04B1/88 | [1981/28] | CPC: |
E04B1/8404 (EP);
E04B1/88 (EP);
E04C1/41 (EP);
E04B2001/848 (EP);
E04B2002/0293 (EP);
Y02A30/244 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, FR, GB, NL, SE | Title | German: | Hohlblockstein | [1981/28] | English: | Hollow building block | [1981/28] | French: | Bloc de construction creux | [1981/28] |
Former [1981/28] | Hohlblockstein bzw. Gebäudewand aus Hohlblocksteinen | ||
Former [1981/28] | Hollow building block resp. wall made from hollow building blocks | ||
Former [1981/28] | Bloc de construction creux respectivement mur en blocs de construction creux | Examination procedure | 15.03.1979 | Examination requested | 24.03.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.05.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 31.07.1980 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1980 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1980 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.04.1982
13.05.1982
ADMISSIBLE Forschungsgemeinschaft Plankenziegel e.V. Schaumburg-Lippe-Str.4 D-5300 Bonn / DE Opponent's representative Behrendt, Arne Schneiders & Behrendt PartmbB Rechts- und Patentanwälte Huestrasse 23 (Kortumkarree) 44787 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.04.1982
13.05.1982
ADMISSIBLE Forschungsgemeinschaft Plankenziegel e.V. Schaumburg-Lippe-Str.4 D-5300 Bonn / DE Opponent's representative Behrendt, Arne, Dipl.-Ing. Schneiders, Behrendt & Partner Rechts- und Patentanwälte Postfach 10 23 65 D-44723 Bochum / DE | ||
Former [1982/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.04.1982
Forschungsgemeinschaft Plankenziegel e.V. Schaumburg-Lippe-Str.4 D-5300 Bonn / DE | 14.05.1982 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.10.1982 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.06.1985 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.06.1985 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.02.1986 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 24.02.1986 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1986/30] | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 16.01.1981 | Date of receipt | 17.02.1981 | Request accepted | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.05.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 25.08.1983 | NL | 01.03.1984 | GB | 25.08.1984 | SE | 26.08.1985 | [2015/21] |
Former [1989/38] | BE | 25.08.1983 | |
NL | 01.03.1984 | ||
GB | 25.08.1984 | ||
CH | 31.08.1984 | ||
SE | 26.08.1985 | ||
Former [1989/17] | BE | 25.08.1983 | |
NL | 01.03.1984 | ||
CH | 31.08.1984 | ||
SE | 26.08.1985 | ||
Former [1989/08] | BE | 25.08.1983 | |
NL | 01.03.1984 | ||
SE | 26.08.1985 | ||
Former [1985/23] | BE | 25.08.1983 | |
NL | 01.03.1984 | ||
Former [1985/15] | BE | 25.08.1983 | Documents cited: | Search | US1934788 [ ] (BOLE GEORGE A, et al); | DE817649 [ ] (KAISER HELMUT DIPL-ING, et al); | FR1084475 [ ]; | FR1092832 [ ]; | CH420555 [ ] (GEBHART SIEGFRIED [DE]); | FR1484273 [ ]; | [D]DE1918816 (C A E C HOWARD LTD); | FR2181619 [ ] (SCHWEITZER ANDRE [FR]); | [X]DE2233212 (BRAMSIEPE ROBERT); | FR2201377 [ ] (MARSEILLE TUILERIES [FR]); | FR2281467 [ ] (HINSE FRANZ [DE]); | FR2292081 [ ] (TOULPAC SA [FR]); | DE2518383 [ ] (ZELLER ADOLF); | FR2307096 [ ] (COMBETTE GERMAIN [FR]) | Examination | DE1789013U | DE1967870U | DE1484273 | DE7624953U |