EP0001248 - Benzopyranothiazoles, their preparation and their use in pressure- or heat-sensitive recording material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petitpierre, Jean Claude, Dr. Aeussere Reben 322 CH-4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 78100856.0 | 09.09.1978 | Priority number, date | CH19770011405 | 19.09.1977 Original published format: CH 1140577 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0001248 | Date: | 04.04.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0001248 | Date: | 01.10.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C07D513/04, B41M5/12, B41M5/26, // C07D277/42 ,(C07D513/04, 311:00, 277:00) | [1980/20] | CPC: |
C07D277/42 (EP,US);
B41M5/15 (EP,US);
B41M5/323 (EP,US);
C07D513/04 (EP,US);
Y10S430/165 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Benzopyranothiazole, ihre Herstellung und ihre Verwendung in druck- oder wärmeempfindlichem Aufzeichnungsmaterial | English: | Benzopyranothiazoles, their preparation and their use in pressure- or heat-sensitive recording material | French: | Benzopyranothiazoles, leur préparation et leur application dans un matériau d'enregistrement sensible à la pression ou à la chaleur | Examination procedure | 27.07.1979 | Examination requested | 22.10.1979 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.12.1979 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.1980 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.1980 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |