EP0001974 - Metal tie with locking head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.1982 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panduit Corp. 17301 Ridgeland Avenue Tinley Park IL 60477 / US | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bulanda, John J. 920 Melrose Street New Lenox Illinois / US | 02 /
Begitschke, Bruce A. 5356 W. 91st Street Oak Lawn Illinois 60453 / US | 03 /
Guzay, Casimir M. 2622 Paula Lane Des Plaines Illinois 60018 / US | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Kador, Utz Ulrich, et al Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kador, Ulrich, et al Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/39] | Kador, Ulrich, Dr., et al Corneliusstrasse 15 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 78100989.9 | 25.09.1978 | Priority number, date | US19770836272 | 26.09.1977 Original published format: US 836272 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0001974 | Date: | 30.05.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1979 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/22, F16B7/08, H02G3/26 | CPC: |
B65D63/08 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1482 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE | Title | German: | Metallbindestreifen mit Verschlussteil | English: | Metal tie with locking head | French: | Bande en métal avec tête de fermeture | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 07.11.1979 | Examination requested [1980/02] | 16.04.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.05.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.1981 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1982/28] | 05.12.1981 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3261062 [ ] (SCARBOROUGH JR CLARENCE H); | GB1439156 [ ] (DENNISON MFG CO); | GB1306175 [ ]; | [A]DE2461338 |