EP0001575 - Impact-resistant, high softening maleic anhydride copolymers and a process for preparing thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.1982 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE STANDARD OIL COMPANY Midland Building Cleveland, Ohio 44115 / US | [1980/12] |
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states THE STANDARD OIL COMPANY Midland Building CLEVELAND 15 Ohio / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Li, George Su-Hsiang 10175 Pirates Trail Aurora Ohio / US | 02 /
Jorkasky II, Richard Joseph 571-C Corkhill Bedford Ohio / US | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 78101031.9 | 29.09.1978 | Priority number, date | US19770842019 | 14.10.1977 Original published format: US 842019 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0001575 | Date: | 02.05.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C08F222/06, C08F2/44, C08F210/00, C08F210/14, C08F222/08, C08L35/00, C08L23/02, // (C08F210/00, 222:06, 222:08) | CPC: |
C08F291/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F291/02, C08F212/08, C08F210/00, C08F222/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Schlagfeste Maleinsäureanhydrid-Copolymere mit hoher Erweichungstemperatur sowie Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | English: | Impact-resistant, high softening maleic anhydride copolymers and a process for preparing thereof | French: | Copolymères d'anhydride maléique résistant aux chocs et possédant une haute température de ramollissement et leur procédé de préparation | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 18.07.1979 | Examination requested | 19.08.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.01.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1982/49] | 30.08.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB981970 (ICI LTD); | [A]GB1028231 (ICI LTD); | [A]DE1445242 (BASF AG) |