EP0001581 - Process and apparatus for mixing and spraying reactants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 14.10.1983 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.1983 | Revocation of patent | published on 14.12.1983 [1983/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pisaric, Karl Heinz Marderweg 86 D-5024 Pulheim / DE | 02 /
Weber, Karl-Arnold, Dr. Saarstrasse 59 D-5090 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
Träubel, Harro, Dr. Dresdener Strasse 14 D-5090 Leverkusen / DE | 04 /
Brauner, Dieter Weyerstrasse 276 D-5650 Solingen 19 / DE | 05 /
Pahl, Manfred, Dr. Goethestrasse 57d D-4047 Dormagen / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 78101042.6 | 30.09.1978 | Priority number, date | DE19772746188 | 14.10.1977 Original published format: DE 2746188 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0001581 | Date: | 02.05.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0001581 | Date: | 06.01.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1979 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/00, B29B1/04, C08G18/10, // D06N3/14 | [1982/01] | CPC: |
C08G18/10 (EP,US);
B01F23/47 (EP,US);
B01F25/42 (EP,US);
B29B7/7419 (EP,US);
B29B7/7605 (EP,US);
C09D175/04 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/324 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Mischen und Auftragen reaktionsfähiger Stoffe | English: | Process and apparatus for mixing and spraying reactants | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour mélanger et appliquer des réactifs | File destroyed: | 06.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 30.09.1978 | Examination requested | 20.08.1979 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 04.08.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.06.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.09.1982
21.10.1982
ADMISSIBLE Elastogran Maschinenbau GmbH, Lemförde Mitterstrassweg D-8021 Strasslach v. München / DE Opponent's representative von Raffay, Vincenz, et al, et al Patentanwälte Raffay & Fleck Geffckenstrasse 6 20249 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.09.1982
21.10.1982
ADMISSIBLE Elastogran Maschinenbau GmbH, Lemförde Mitterstrassweg D-8021 Strasslach v. München / DE Opponent's representative von Raffay, Vincenz, Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Patentanwälte Raffay, Fleck & Partner Postfach 32 32 17 D-20117 Hamburg / DE | 22.10.1982 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.02.1983 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.07.1983 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 16.09.1983 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1983/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1059655 (BAYER AG); | [A]DE1778060 (BAYER AG); | DE2226043 [ ] (RANSBURG ELECTRO COATING CORP); | GB1313182 [ ] (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER); | DE2252872 [ ] (BEKAERT SA NV); | DE2211055 [ ] (CLASEN HEINRICH); | DE2245082 [ ] (KUNSTSTOFF VERFAHRENSTECHNIK D); | [A]DE2344272 (SECMER SA); | [A]DE2252201 (BAYER AG, et al); | DE2349433 [ ] (VER FOERDERUNG INST KUNSTSTOFF); | DE2447369 [ ] (BASF AG); | DE2538437 [ ] (ELASTOGRAN GMBH); | DE2543302 [ ] (BAYER AG, et al) |