EP0002058 - 3-(2-Aminoethylthio-6-ethyl-7-oxo-1-azabicylo-(3.2.0)-hept-2-en-2-carboxylic acid, process for preparing it and compositions comprising it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/25] | New antibiotic having beta-lactamase inhibitory activity, its production and use as antimicrobial agent | ||
[1982/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanraku-Ocean Co., Ltd. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states SANRAKU-OCEAN CO., LTD. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states Sanraku Incorporated 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okamura, Kazuhiko 2412 Kamiwada Yamato-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Hirata, Shoji 51-8, Aza Tateminami Watari-cho Watari-gun Miyagi-ken / JP | 03 /
Okumura, Yasushi 534-1, Ueki Kamakura-shi Kanagwa-ken / JP | 04 /
Fukagawa, Yasuo 1194-146 Imaizumi Kamakura-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Shimauchi, Yasutaka 1-101-13, Yurigaoka Ninomiya-machi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 06 /
Ishikura, Tomoyuki 640, Kowada Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 07 /
Kouno, Kageaki 7-16-3, Ikegami Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 08 /
Lein, Joseph 4, Thornwood LN Fayetteville New York / US | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Krause, Dieter, et al Tillmannsweg 4 14109 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/25] | Krause, Dieter, et al Tillmannsweg 4 D-14109 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 78101384.2 | 16.11.1978 | Priority number, date | JP19770137276 | 17.11.1977 Original published format: JP 13727677 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0002058 | Date: | 30.05.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0002058 | Date: | 23.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C12P17/10, A61K31/40, // (C07D487/04, 209:00, 205:00) | [1982/25] | CPC: |
C07D477/20 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C12P17/184 (EP);
Y02P20/55 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1982/25] | C07D487/04, A61K31/40, C07B29/02, // C12D13/02 ,(C07D487/04, 209:00, 205:00),(A61K31/42, 31:40),(A61K31/545, 31:40) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | 3-(2-Aminoäthylthio)-6-äthyl-7-oxo-1-azabicylo-(3.2.0)-hept-2-en-2-carbonsäure, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und sie enthaltende Mittel | [1982/25] | English: | 3-(2-Aminoethylthio-6-ethyl-7-oxo-1-azabicylo-(3.2.0)-hept-2-en-2-carboxylic acid, process for preparing it and compositions comprising it | [1982/25] | French: | 3-(2-Aminoéthylthio-6-éthyl-7-oxo-1-azabicylo-(3.2.0)-hept-2-en-2-acide carboxylique, procédé pour sa préparation et compositions le contenant | [1982/25] |
Former [1982/25] | Antibiotikum mit beta-Lactamase hemmender Aktivität, seine Herstellung und Verwendung als antimikrobielles Mittel | ||
Former [1982/25] | New antibiotic having beta-lactamase inhibitory activity, its production and use as antimicrobial agent | ||
Former [1982/25] | Antibiotique ayant une activité inhibitrice de béta-lactamase, sa production et son usage comme agent antimicrobien | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 18.07.1979 | Examination requested [1980/01] | 20.02.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.12.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [P]DE2815157 (MERCK & CO INC) |