EP0004844 - Apparatus for manufacturing plastic products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/48] | Method and apparatus for manufacturing plastic products | ||
[1983/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.1984 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.11.1984 [1984/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOGURE, YAMATO No. 663 5821, Masago-cho Niigata-shi Niigata / JP | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/41] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 78101546.6 | 04.12.1978 | Priority number, date | JP19780046048 | 19.04.1978 Original published format: JP 4604878 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0004844 | Date: | Status: | (deleted) | [N/P] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0004844 | Date: | 31.10.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0004844 | Date: | 30.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1979 | Classification | IPC: | B29C1/02, B29F1/022 | [1983/48] | CPC: |
B22C9/04 (EP);
B22C23/00 (EP);
B22C9/043 (EP);
B29C33/3857 (EP);
B29C45/37 (EP);
A61C13/16 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Kunststoffgegenständen | [1983/48] | English: | Apparatus for manufacturing plastic products | [1983/48] | French: | Dispositif pour la fabrication de produits en matière plastique | [1983/48] |
Former [1983/48] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Kunststoffgegenständen | ||
Former [1983/48] | Method and apparatus for manufacturing plastic products | ||
Former [1983/48] | Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication de produits en matière plastique | Examination procedure | 07.01.1980 | Examination requested [1980/07] | 24.09.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.11.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1980 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.1981 | 01.01.1982 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   09.01.1982 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1147812 [ ]; | DE743598 [ ]; | US2397168 [ ]; | GB233240 [ ]; | US1970261 [ ]; | US2822592 [ ]; | US1631249 [ ]; | US1639416 [ ]; | DE2543554 [ ]; | GB539239 [ ] | Examination | - The Standard Handbook of Textiles; A.J. HALL/Newnes Butterworth 8th Ed. P.281. |