EP0002505 - Plinth for electric domestic appliances [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 21.07.1983 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.1998 | Change - no opposition filed | published on 15.07.1998 [1998/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bauknecht Hausgeräte GmbH Am Wallgraben 99 D-70565 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Degel, Josef Tulpenstrasse 5 D-6653 Blieskastel / DE | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Meier, Friedrich, et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Wendenstrasse 35 Postfach 10 51 49 D-2000 Hamburg 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/08] | Meier, Friedrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Wendenstrasse 35 Postfach 10 51 49 D-2000 Hamburg 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 78101611.8 | 08.12.1978 | Priority number, date | DE19772756945 | 21.12.1977 Original published format: DE 2756945 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0002505 | Date: | 27.06.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0002505 | Date: | 25.02.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1979 | Classification | IPC: | A47B95/00 | [1981/08] | CPC: |
A47B91/005 (EP);
A47B95/002 (EP);
A47B2095/004 (EP);
A47L15/4265 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE | Title | German: | Blende für Sockel elektrischer Haushaltgeräte | English: | Plinth for electric domestic appliances | French: | Plinthe pour appareil électroménager | Examination procedure | 23.07.1979 | Examination requested | 08.10.1979 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 08.01.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 03.04.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.09.1980 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.1980 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.1980 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.1981
09.11.1981
ADMISSIBLE BOSCH-SIEMENS HAUSGERÄTE GMBH, München Patent- und Vertragswesen Hochstrasse 17 Postfach 100250 D-80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.1981
09.11.1981
ADMISSIBLE BOSCH-SIEMENS HAUSGERÄTE GMBH, München Patent- und Vertragswesen Hochstrasse 17 Postfach 100250 D-80076 München / DE | 28.12.1981 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.04.1982 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.07.1982 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 09.09.1982 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 30.03.1983 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 10.06.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [1983/38] | 10.06.1983 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1983/38] | 15.07.1998 | Deletion: No opposition filed within time limit [1998/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1980 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.02.1981 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2556518 [ ] (LICENTIA GMBH); | DE2416077 [ ] (KRAUSE KG ROBERT); | DE1960915 [ ] (ALNO MOEBEL) |