EP0002781 - Process for the preparation of aliphatic carbonylic compounds substituted by hydroxylic groups which are etherified by aliphatic groups [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dudeck, Christian, Dr. Odenwaldring 20 D-6703 Limburgerhof / DE | 02 /
Lehmann, Gunter Bayernstrasse 58 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
Petri, Norbert, Dr. Max-Beckmann-Strasse 17 D-6710 Frankenthal / DE | 04 /
Diem, Hans, Dr. Feldbergstrasse 63 D-6800 Mannheim 25 / DE | 05 /
Fliege, Werner, Dr. Authariestrasse 6 D-6701 Otterstadt / DE | 06 /
Meissner, Bernd, Dr. Dammweg 15 D-6900 Heidelberg 1 / DE | 07 /
Ross, Karl-Heinz, Dr. Sudetenstrasse 8 D-6704 Mutterstadt / DE | 08 /
Muehlthaler, Wolfgang Regerstrasse 13 D-6944 Hemsbach / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 78101758.7 | 19.12.1978 | Priority number, date | DE19772758124 | 24.12.1977 Original published format: DE 2758124 | DE19782815752 | 12.04.1978 Original published format: DE 2815752 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0002781 | Date: | Status: | (deleted) | [N/P] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0002781 | Date: | 11.07.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0002781 | Date: | 26.11.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/29, C07C45/37, B01J35/02, B01J23/72, B01J27/14, // C07C47/198, C07C49/175 | [1980/24] | CPC: |
B01J23/50 (EP,US);
B01J23/72 (EP,US);
B01J27/14 (EP,US);
B01J35/00 (EP,US);
B01J35/30 (EP,US);
B01J37/0228 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1980/24] | C07C45/16, B01J35/02, B01J23/72, B01J27/14, // C07C47/19, C07C49/175 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von aliphatischen, mit aliphatischen Gruppen verätherten hydroxysubstituierten Carbonylverbindungen | English: | Process for the preparation of aliphatic carbonylic compounds substituted by hydroxylic groups which are etherified by aliphatic groups | French: | Procédé de préparation de composés carbonyliques aliphatiques, substitués par des groupes hydroxyliques éthérifiés par des groupes aliphatiques | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 10.12.1979 | Examination requested [1980/05] | 29.04.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.05.1980 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.1980 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.1980 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2170855 (CHITWOOD HENRY C); | [A]DE1923048 (LAPORTE CHEMICAL) |