EP0010555 - Process for producing plastic products having an up-graded surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.1980 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.1980 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.10.1980 [1980/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heimann, Oscar Sonnrisa CH-6052 Hergiswil / CH | For all designated states Brandenberger, Hansruedy Stotzenackerweg 5 6343 Risch / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1980/10] | For all designated states Heimann, Oscar Sonnrisa CH-6052 Hergiswil / CH | ||
For all designated states Brandenberger, Hansruedy Stotzenackerweg 5 CH-6343 Risch / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1980/10] | Representative(s) | Utiger, Heinrich Postfach 77 David-Hess-Weg 16 8060 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1980/10] | Utiger, Heinrich, Prof. Dr. phil. Postfach 77 David-Hess-Weg 16 CH-8060 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 78101812.2 | 21.12.1978 | [1980/10] | Priority number, date | CH19780010144 | 30.09.1978 Original published format: CH 1014478 | [1980/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0010555 | Date: | 14.05.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/06, C08J3/20, B44C3/04 | [1980/10] | CPC: |
C08J3/20 (EP);
B44C3/042 (EP);
B44F9/04 (EP);
C08K5/20 (EP);
C08J2367/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/20, C08L67/06 (EP);
C08L67/06, C08L3/08 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1980/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer veredelten Kunststoffoberfläche | [1980/10] | English: | Process for producing plastic products having an up-graded surface | [1980/10] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de produits en matière plastique à surface améliorée | [1980/10] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 20.08.1980 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1980/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1082385 [ ]; | FR1462079 [ ]; | DE2234893 [ ] |