EP0000214 - Process for the preparation of a solid carbon-containing material having a sorption capacity for metal ions. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states AKZO N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states Akzo N.V. Postbus 186 Velperweg 76 NL-6800 LS Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Jong, Geert Jan Oude Deldenerweg 220 7548 PN Boekelo / NL | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Sieders, René AKZO NOBEL N.V. Patent Department (Dept. CO) P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1981/04] | Sieders, René AKZO NOBEL N.V. Patent Department (Dept. CO) P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 78200033.5 | 09.06.1978 | Priority number, date | NL19770006879 | 22.06.1977 Original published format: NL 7706879 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0000214 | Date: | 10.01.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0000214 | Date: | 28.01.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1978 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/20, C01B31/12, // C02F1/28 | [1981/04] | CPC: |
C02F1/283 (EP,US);
C01B32/33 (EP,US);
C01B32/342 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1981/04] | C01B31/12, B01D15/00, C02C5/02 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines festen kohlenstoffhaltigen Materials mit Sorptionsvermögen für Metallionen | English: | Process for the preparation of a solid carbon-containing material having a sorption capacity for metal ions. | French: | Procédé de préparation d'une matière solide contenant du carbone ayant un pouvoir de sorption pour des ions métalliques. | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 07.05.1979 | Examination requested | 07.08.1979 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 12.10.1979 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1979 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.06.1980 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.1980 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.1980 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 28.01.1981 | FR | 28.01.1981 | NL | 28.04.1981 | [2002/24] |
Former [1982/38] | BE | 28.01.1981 | |
NL | 28.04.1981 | ||
Former [1981/32] | NL | 28.04.1981 | Documents cited: | Search | FR587359 [ ] (CHEMISCHE PRODUKTION M B H GES); | [A]FR849046 ; | [A]FR1089139 (STAMICARBON); | US2829115 [ ] (BUSHONG RAYMOND M, et al); | DE2320886 [ ] (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO); | FR2253815 [ ] (MARUZEN OIL CO LTD [JP]) |