EP0000610 - Method and apparatus for spraying a metered quantity of a semi-liquid product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY 301 East Sixth Street Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY 301 East Sixth Street Cincinnati Ohio 45202 / US | ||
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY 301 East Sixth Street Cincinnati Ohio 45201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kock, Ronald Wayne 1854 Greenpine Dr. Cincinnati, Ohio 45231 / US | 02 /
Merz, Theodore Paul 6108 Cary Avenue Cincinnati, Ohio 45224 / US | 03 /
Platt, Paul Kester 805 Carini Lane Cincinnati, Ohio 45218 / US | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Ernst, Hubert, et al 16, avenue Foch 59800 Lille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/06] | Munro, Hamish David, et al PROCTER & GAMBLE EUROPEAN TECHNICAL CENTER Temselaan 100 B-1820 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 78200113.5 | 20.07.1978 | Priority number, date | US19770820508 | 01.08.1977 Original published format: US 820508 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0000610 | Date: | 07.02.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0000610 | Date: | 11.02.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1978 | Classification | IPC: | B05B11/00, A45D34/00, B05B17/04, A47K5/12, A61M11/00 | [1981/06] | CPC: |
A45D34/00 (EP,US);
A47K5/1202 (EP,US);
B05B11/02 (EP,US);
B05B11/1092 (EP,US);
B05B17/06 (US);
B05B1/083 (EP);
B05B1/18 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Zerstaubung von einer bestimmten Menge halbflüssigen Materials | English: | Method and apparatus for spraying a metered quantity of a semi-liquid product | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la pulvérisation d'une quantité prédéterminée d'un produit semi-liquide | Examination procedure | 26.07.1979 | Examination requested | 16.11.1979 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 19.11.1979 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.07.1980 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.1980 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.1980 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |