EP0003065 - Process for the production of potassium chloride [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 29.09.1983 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG Postfach 10 15 01 60015 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ertl, Dietrich, Dr. Parkstrasse 10 D-6240 Königstein / DE | 02 /
Ueberle, Dieter Letzter Hasenpfad 13 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 70 / DE | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Ernst (DE) Reuterweg 14 D-60323 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/35] | Fischer, Ernst, Dr. Reuterweg 14 D-60323 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 78200366.9 | 14.12.1978 | Priority number, date | DE19782801705 | 16.01.1978 Original published format: DE 2801705 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0003065 | Date: | 25.07.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0003065 | Date: | 02.09.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C01D3/08 | [1981/35] | CPC: |
C01D3/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Gewinnung von Kaliumchlorid | English: | Process for the production of potassium chloride | French: | Procédé pour la production de chlorure de potassium | Examination procedure | 16.01.1980 | Examination requested [1980/07] | 16.09.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.11.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.02.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.05.1982
14.07.1982
ADMISSIBLE Kali und Salz AG Postfach 10 20 29 D-34111 Kassel / DE | [1982/31] | 14.07.1982 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.11.1982 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.06.1983 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 31.08.1983 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1983/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.12.1981 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | DE1567985 [ ] (KALI FORSCHUNGSINSTITUT X); | DE1064044 [ ]; | DE1226090 [ ] (WINTERSHALL AG); | DE374017 [ ] (KRUPP AG, et al) |