EP0000282 - Improvements in or relating to optical fibres and glasses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 31.03.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE POST OFFICE 23 Howland Street London W1P 6HQ / GB | [1980/11] |
Former [1980/11] | For all designated states Post Office 23 Howland Street London W1P 6HQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beales, Keith John 40 Church Lane Henley Ipswich Suffolk / GB | 02 /
Duncan, William James 34 Birchwood Drive Rushmere St Andrew Ipswich Suffolk / GB | 03 /
Dunn, Anthony Gladwyn 22 Orchard Close Melton Woodbridge Suffolk / GB | 04 /
Newns, George Reginald Wayside House Hintlesham Suffolk / GB | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Daley, Michael John, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [1990/20] |
Former [1981/36] | Smith, Norman Ian F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | ||
Former [1980/12] | Miselbach, Roger George British Telecom Intellectual Property Unit 13th Floor 151 Gower Street London WC1E 6BA / GB | ||
Former [1980/12] | Fransella, Mary Evelyn Post Office Patents Branch THQ/P&S5.2 207 Old Street London EC1V 9PS / GB | Application number, filing date | 78300096.1 | 28.06.1978 | Priority number, date | GB19770026924 | 28.06.1977 Original published format: GB 2692477 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0000282 | Date: | 10.01.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0000282 | Date: | 26.08.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/34] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0000282 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1978 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/089, C03C13/00, G02B6/18 | [1990/20] | CPC: |
G02B6/03627 (EP,US);
C03C13/046 (EP,US);
C03C3/089 (EP,US);
G02B6/0281 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1981/34] | C03C3/08, C03C13/00, G02B5/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verbesserung von optischen Fasern und Gläsern | English: | Improvements in or relating to optical fibres and glasses | French: | Perfectionnement apporté aux fibres et verres optiques | Examination procedure | 26.06.1979 | Examination requested | 23.10.1979 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.03.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.1982
30.06.1982
ADMISSIBLE SCHOTT GLASWERKE Hattenbergstrasse 10 D-55122 Mainz / DE Opponent's representative Schmitz, Waldemar Schmitz + Rasper Patentanwälte Lessingstrasse 10 D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.1982
30.06.1982
ADMISSIBLE SCHOTT GLASWERKE Hattenbergstrasse 10 D-55122 Mainz / DE Opponent's representative Schmitz, Waldemar, Dipl.-Phys. Schmitz + Rasper Patentanwälte Lessingstrasse 10 D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1982/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.1982
SCHOTT GLASWERKE Hattenbergstrasse 10 D-55122 Mainz / DE Opponent's representative Rasper, Joachim, Dr. Bierstadter Höhe 22 D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | 01.07.1982 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.01.1983 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.08.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 17.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 14.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 11.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 15.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 09.11.1989 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.11.1989 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.11.1989 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 31.01.1990 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 14.06.1985 | Appeal received No. T0170/85 | 16.08.1985 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.05.1987 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M08) [1987/19] | 03.01.1988 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1988/01] | 12.02.1988 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1988/07] | 13.04.1988 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1988/16] | 27.09.1988 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 27.09.1988 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.09.1988 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1301409 [ ]; | GB954836 [ ] (OWENS CORNING FIBERGLASS CORP); | [AD]US3957342 (NEWNS GEORGE REGINALD, et al); | [A]GB1319670 (NIPPON SELFOC CO LTD); | [A]US3859103 (YOSHIYAGAWA MITSUGI, et al) | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, vol. 123, nr. 6, june 1976, London, T. INOUE et al. "Low-loss light focusing fibres manufactured by a continuous process", pages 577-580. |