EP0001330 - Process for increasing hydrogenation rate of polyolefins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jackson, Steven Mark 649 - ACranbury Crossroad North Brunswick New Jersey 08902 / US | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/01] | Jones, Alan John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 78300321.3 | 25.08.1978 | Priority number, date | US19770827532 | 25.08.1977 Original published format: US 827532 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0001330 | Date: | 04.04.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0001330 | Date: | 09.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/04, // C10M3/12 | [1982/23] | CPC: |
C07C5/03 (EP,US);
C07C2521/08 (EP,US);
C07C2523/755 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erhöhung der Hydrierungsgeschwindigkeit von Polyolefinen | English: | Process for increasing hydrogenation rate of polyolefins | French: | Procédé pour augmenter la vitesse d'hydrogénation de polyoléfines | File destroyed: | 26.08.1996 | Examination procedure | 12.09.1978 | Examination requested [1980/11] | 12.12.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.11.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH102274 (URFER CHARLES [CH]); | US2181640 [ ] (DEANEALY RICHARD M, et al); | [A]US2454171 (HEPP HAROLD J); | US2461959 [ ] (BRANDON RICHARD C); | GB933127 [ ] (BASF AG); | [A]GB940143 (ATLANTIC REFINING CO); | [A]GB1123427 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO); | US3415898 [ ] (WALKER DARRELL W); | [A]DE1945361 (TECHNOCHEMIE GMBH); | [A]GB1461132 (SNAM PROGETTI); | [A]FR2344576 (LABOFINA SA [BE]) |