EP0002903 - A multi-stage gear crank for a cycle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shimano Industrial Company Limited 77, Oimatsu-cho, 3-chome, Sakai-shi Osaka 570-8577 / JP | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueno, Tadashi 305 Sowa-ryo, 4-2, 3-cho Shinkanaoko-cho Sakai-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Szczuka, Jan Tymoteusz, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/27] | Szczuka, Jan Tymoteusz, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 78300782.6 | 11.12.1978 | Priority number, date | JP19770152238 | 16.12.1977 Original published format: JP 15223877 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0002903 | Date: | 11.07.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0002903 | Date: | 08.07.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1979 | Classification | IPC: | B62M9/10 | [1981/27] | CPC: |
B62M9/105 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Kurbelachse mit mehreren Gängen für ein Fahrrad | English: | A multi-stage gear crank for a cycle | French: | Pédalier à plusieurs étages pour une bicyclette | Examination procedure | 26.06.1979 | Examination requested | 12.12.1979 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.12.1980 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3956943 [ ] (YAMASAKI KAZUTO); | FR2376021 [ ] (SHIMANO INDUSTRIAL CO [JP]); | FR1168825 [ ] |