EP0002623 - Electric arc apparatus and method for treating a flow of material by an electric arc [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.1984 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.1984 [1984/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NATIONAL RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | For all designated states Hilliard, John Clifford Flat 3 22 Dagmar Road London SE5 / GB | For all designated states Jones, Alan Russell 4 Fairholme Road Ashford Middlesex / GB | For all designated states Weinberg, Felix Jiri 59 Vicarage Road London SW14 / GB | [1981/47] |
Former [1981/47] | For all designated states Chan, Anthony Kok Fai 22A Brondesbury Road London NW6 / GB | ||
For all designated states Hilliard, John Clifford Flat 3 22 Dagmar Road London SE5 / GB | |||
For all designated states Jones, Alan Russell 4 Fairholme Road Ashford Middlesex / GB | |||
For all designated states Weinberg, Felix Jiri 59 Vicarage Road London SW14 / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chan, Anthony Kok Fai 22A Brondesbury Road London NW6 / GB | 02 /
Hilliard, John Clifford Flat 3, 22 Dagmar Road London SE5 / GB | 03 /
Jones, Alan Russell 4 Fairholme Road Ashford, Middlesex / GB | 04 /
Weinberg, Felix Jiri 59 Vicarage Road London SW14 / GB | [1983/36] |
Former [1981/47] | 01 /
Chan, Anthony Kok Fai 22A Brondesbury Road London NW6 / GB | ||
02 /
Hilliard, John Clifford Flat 3, 22 Dagmar Road London SE5 / GB | |||
03 /
Jones, Alan Russell 4 Fairholme Road Ashford, Middlesex / GB | |||
04 /
Weinberg, Felix Jiri 59 Vicarage Road | |||
Former [1981/47] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Laight, Martin Harvey, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/47] | Laight, Martin Harvey, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | ||
Former [1981/47] | Laight, Martin Harvey W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 78300861.8 | 19.12.1978 | Priority number, date | GB19770052925 | 20.12.1977 Original published format: GB 5292577 | GB19380057878 | 28.09.1978 Original published format: GB 3857878 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0002623 | Date: | 27.06.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0002623 | Date: | 07.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1979 | Classification | IPC: | H05H1/34, H01J37/32 | [1983/36] | CPC: |
H01J37/32055 (EP,US);
H05H1/34 (EP,US);
H05H1/3468 (EP,US);
H05H1/3478 (EP,US);
H05H1/3484 (EP,US);
H05H1/40 (EP,US);
H05H1/42 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1983/36] | H05H1/26, H01J37/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Lichtbogenapparat und Verfahren zur Behandlung eines Materialstroms mit einem Lichtbogen | English: | Electric arc apparatus and method for treating a flow of material by an electric arc | French: | Dispositif à arc électrique et méthode de traitement d'une matière en écoulement par un arc électrique | Examination procedure | 13.12.1979 | Examination requested [1980/05] | 10.07.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 03.02.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.01.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1189068 [ ]; | GB955702 [ ] (ICI LTD, et al); | US3361927 [ ] (BUHLER ROLF D); | US3594609 [ ] (VAS ALEXANDRU) | [ ] - 2nd INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON GAS DISCHARGES, 11-15 September 1972, Savoy Place, London WC2 (published 1972 by the Institution of Electrical Engineers). K.A. BUNTING: "The development and characteristics of an arc heater with hydrogen as the plasma working fluid", pages 138-140. * Page 138, left-hand column, lines 1-15 and right-hand column, lines 1-34 and 51-61; figure 1 * |