EP0012781 - Expansible chamber apparatus with pairs of cylindrical rollers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hopkins, Walter M. 1306 W. Glenoaks Glendale CA.91201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states Hopkins, Walter M. 1306 W. Glenoaks Glendale CA.91201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1980/14] | Representative(s) | Wilson, Joseph Martin, et al WITHERS & ROGERS 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | [1980/14] | Application number, filing date | 78300922.8 | 29.12.1978 | [1980/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0012781 | Date: | 09.07.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0012781 | Date: | 08.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1979 | Classification | IPC: | F16H21/30, F01B1/08 | [1980/14] | CPC: |
F01B1/08 (EP);
F16H21/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/14] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung mit Kammern veränderlichen Volumens mit Paaren von zylindrischen Rollen | [1980/14] | English: | Expansible chamber apparatus with pairs of cylindrical rollers | [1980/14] | French: | Appareil à chambre expansible avec des paires de rouleaux cylindriques | [1980/14] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 17.11.1980 | Examination requested [1981/04] | 19.10.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 12.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.07.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 08.02.1984 | IT | 08.02.1984 | NL | 08.02.1984 | SE | 08.02.1984 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 08.02.1984 | |
IT | 08.02.1984 | ||
NL | 08.02.1984 | ||
SE | 08.02.1984 | ||
Former [1985/23] | BE | 08.02.1984 | |
NL | 08.02.1984 | ||
SE | 08.02.1984 | ||
Former [1985/16] | BE | 08.02.1984 | |
SE | 08.02.1984 | ||
Former [1984/33] | SE | 08.02.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | US3641985 [ ]; | US3606795 [ ]; | FR1454557 [ ]; | US3401568 [ ]; | US1535464 [ ] | Examination | DE11647 |