EP0003006 - A rock drill boom structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atlas Copco Aktiebolag Nacka 105 23 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states Atlas Copco Aktiebolag Nacka S-105 23 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states Atlas Copco Aktiebolag Nacka / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herron, Lorne Robert Svartkärrsvägen 12 nb S-133 00 Saltsjöbaden / SE | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Molin, Alexis, et al c/o Atlas Copco Aktiebolag Patent Department S-105 23 Stockholm / SE | [1981/41] | Application number, filing date | 78850026.2 | 19.12.1978 | Priority number, date | ZA19770007581 | 21.12.1977 Original published format: ZA 777581 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0003006 | Date: | 11.07.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0003006 | Date: | 14.10.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1979 | Classification | IPC: | E21C11/02 | [1981/41] | CPC: |
E21B7/022 (EP,US);
E21B3/04 (EP,US);
E21B7/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE | Title | German: | Auslegeranordnung für Gesteinsbohrer | English: | A rock drill boom structure | French: | Disposition de la flèche d'une machine perforatrice | Examination procedure | 19.12.1979 | Examination requested [1980/06] | 03.07.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.03.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1325240 [ ] (GARDNER DENVER CO); | US3809344 [ ] (KOLDERUP E, et al); | FR1074534 [ ] (TECH POUR L IND MINIERE SOC); | FR1002670 [ ] (NU SSE UND GRAFER K G MASCHF); | FR1033622 [ ] (RUDOLF HAUSHERR & SOHNE MASCHF) | [ ] - GLUCKAUF, Vol. 108, April 1972, MONNINGHOFF "Strecken- und Ankerlochbohreinrichtungen fur BergbauTunnel- und Stollenbau" page A 133 |