EP0006853 - FORM OF IMPLANT MEDICAMENT AND PREPARATION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.1981 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Garching Instrumente Gesellschaft zur industriellen Nutzung von Forschungsergebnissen m.b.H. Leonrodstrasse 56 D-8000 München 19 / DE | [1980/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BISSON, Heinrich Jakob Züricherstrasse 17 CH-8103 Unterengstringen / CH | 02 /
SPEISER, Peter Paul Wassbergstrasse 26 CH-8127 Forch / CH | [1980/02] | Representative(s) | Huber, Bernhard, et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/02] | Huber, Bernhard, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 78900009.8 | 07.06.1978 | [1980/02] | WO1978DE00003 | Priority number, date | CH19770007082 | 07.06.1977 Original published format: CH 708277 | [1980/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO7800011 | Date: | 21.12.1978 | [1978/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0006853 | Date: | 23.01.1980 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.1978 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1980/02] | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/26, A61K9/52 | [1980/02] | CPC: |
A61K9/0024 (EP);
A61K9/1641 (EP);
A61K9/1647 (EP);
A61K9/204 (EP);
A61K9/2045 (EP);
A61K9/5153 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB [1980/02] | Title | German: | DEPOTARZNEIFORM UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [1980/02] | English: | FORM OF IMPLANT MEDICAMENT AND PREPARATION PROCESS | [1980/02] | French: | FORME D'IMPLANT MEDICAMENTEUX ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | [1980/02] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.1979 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.1979 | Examination requested [1986/31] | 23.05.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.1981 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1981/27] | 20.03.1981 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1981/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1980 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2051580 ; | FR2287242 [ ]; | [A]FR2126270 ; | [A]US3880991 ; | [A]US3297033 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 82, Nr. 8, 21. April 1975 Columbus, Ohio, USA. YOLLES, SEYMOUR; LAFE, THOMAS D.; MEYER, FRANCIS J.: "Timed-release depot for anticance r agents" Seite 355, Auszug Nr.103110h - J.PHARM. SCI 197564 (1) 115-16 (Eng.). |